School Governors
The governors have overall responsibility for the school and are representative of the community which it serves.
Foundation Governors
Vice Chair - Mrs Chinyere Offorji
(Term of Office Starts - 13th March 2020 - Term of office Ends – 8th Mach 2024)
Appointed by the Archdiocese of Southwark Education Commission. She serves on the Resources & Premises Committee, Pay Appeal Committee, Pupil Discipline Committee and Staff Grievance & Disciplinary Committee. She is responsible for the area of Looked After Children and Health and Well Being. There are no relevant business/pecuniary interest or staff/governor relationships. Attendance for Full Governors meetings = 3/3
Foundation Governor - Mrs Ivie Omigie
(Term of Office Starts - 11th May 2020 - Term of Office Ends – 10th May 2024)
Appointed by the Archdiocese of Southwark Education Commission. She serves on the Learning & Achievement Committee, Resources & Premises Committee, Pupil Discipline Committee. She is responsible for Health & Safety. There are no relevant business/pecuniary interest or staff/governor relationships. Attendance for Full Governors meetings = 3/3
Chair of Governors - Mrs Zaynab Sholola
(Term of Office Starts - 11th May 2022 - Term of Office Ends – 10th May 2026)
Appointed by the Archdiocese of Southwark Education Commission. She serves on the Learning & Achievement Committee, Resources & Premises Committee, Pupil Discipline Committee. She is responsible for Safeguarding/Child Protection. There are no relevant business/pecuniary interest or staff/governor relationships. Attendance for Full Governors meetings = 3/3
Parent Governor - Mrs Myriam Kanga
(Term of Office Starts - 25th Nov 2022 - Term of Office Ends - 25th Nov 2026)
Appointed by the Parent Election process. She serves on the Learning & Achievement Committee, Resources & Premises Committee. She is responsible for R.E. / Pupil Premium. There are no relevant business/pecuniary interest or staff/governor relationships. Attendance for Full Governors meetings = 1/1
Parent Governor - Mrs Tosha Phillippa-Epelle
(Term of Office Starts - May 2024 - Term of Office Ends - May 2028)
Appointed by the Parent Election process. She serves on the Learning & Achievement Committee, Resources & Premises Committee. There are no relevant business/pecuniary interest or staff/governor relationships.
Co-opt Governor - Mrs Sophia Wellington
(Term of Office Starts 18th Oct 2021 - Term of Office Ends – 18th Oct 2024)
Appointed by the Archdiocese of Southwark Education Commission. She serves on the Learning & Achievement Committee. She is responsible for SEND. There are no relevant business/pecuniary interest or staff/governor relationships. Attendance for Full Governors meetings = 3/3
Headteacher
Ms D Webb – Headteacher Governor
She serves on the Learning & Achievement Committee. She serves on the Resources & Premises Committee, Admissions and Pay Committee. There are no relevant business/pecuniary interest or staff/governor relationships. Attendance for Full Governors meetings = 3/3
Staff Governor
Ms Rebecca Walker– Staff Governor – (Term of Office Starts – 11th Dec 2020)
Appointed through the staff election process. She serves on the Learning & Achievement Committee, Resources & Premises Committee. There are no relevant business/pecuniary interest or staff/governor relationships. Attendance for Full Governors meetings = 3/3